Girlguiding Kent West

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girlguiding Kent West offers girls and young women quality girl-led guiding opportunities, presenting challenge and adventure, which develop their potential and enable them to make a positive contribution to their community and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
2300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 14 April 1964: Standard registration
- GIRLGUIDING KENT WEST (Working name)
- COUNTY OF KENT (WEST) BRANCH OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- COUNTY OF KENT (WEST) BRANCH OF THE GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Beverly Harvey | Chair | 01 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Rhiannon Sherratt | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Mary Richardson | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Davis | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Lesley Austen | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE STEARN | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Karen Anne East | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.72k | £19.97k | £9.88k | £19.71k | £42.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.51k | £26.80k | £13.93k | £24.49k | £41.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 7TH AUGUST 1963 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1938 as amended on 12 May 2018
Charitable objects
COUNTY OF KENT (WEST) BRANCH OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF KENT (WEST)
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Chestnut Avenue
CHATHAM
Kent
ME5 9BB
- Phone:
- 07977766352
- Email:
- ggkentwest@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window