Financial history EAST WINCH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 303943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.18k £2.31k £6.36k £7.38k £8.19k
Total expenditure £3.00k £3.19k £10.00k £7.33k £7.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A