LUCY CAVENDISH COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
From October 2021 the College will admit talented students from the age of 18 years regardless of gender, particularly from non-traditional backgrounds, to undertake education or research of the highest quality in the University of Cambridge. The College aims to become broadly representative of UK society and to increase the proportion of international students from under-represented backgrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£16,820,692
Donations and legacies | £3.75m | |
Charitable activities | £10.52m | |
Other trading activities | £1.56m | |
Investments | £558.20k | |
Other | £431.85k |
Total expenditure:
£12,285,829
Raising funds | £1.24m | |
Charitable activities | £10.75m | |
Other | £298.06k |
£2,043,337 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.54m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.75m | |
Retained for future use | £4.53m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.54m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.75m | |
Retained for future use | £6.58m |
People

131 Employee(s)
45 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 07 September 2010: Standard registration
- LUCY CAVENDISH COLLEGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
45 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Madeleine Julia Atkins | Chair | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Xuyu Zhang | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Pruitt | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nabil Khabirpour | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Kay Heather | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Harold | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Walker Gore | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John McNiff | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Xiaoxiang Na | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Liam Saddington | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Xin Fan | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Macdonald | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Hughes | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Murphy | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Poorna Mysoor | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard George Cosmo Lloyd | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joe Sutliff Sanders | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julian David Gilbey | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nooman Haque | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jurgen Becque | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patricia Lebre Alireza | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark John King | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Claire Fistein | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Fowell | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katie Keller | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Howard Nelson | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Sparkes | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prof Neil Rennie Stott | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek Jones | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bruno Cotta | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Blakesley | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Professor Marie-Claire Cordonier Segger | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Deborah Talmi | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Git | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vivian Wai Man Yiu | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Marie Tonkin | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marissa Quie | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Kathleen Ryan | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Isabel Clare Huntington Clare | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor KAREN OTTEWELL | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor HENRIETTE HENDRIKS | Trustee | 27 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
Professor SABINE BAHN | Trustee | 27 June 2007 |
|
|
||||
Dr JANE GREATOREX | Trustee | 01 October 2003 |
|
|
||||
ALISON VINNICOMBE | Trustee | 26 February 1997 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR RUTH CAMERON | Trustee | 01 October 1993 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.26m | £6.38m | £11.82m | £13.19m | £15.44m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.22m | £6.26m | £8.64m | £10.75m | £12.29m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.50m | £1.62m | £4.64m | £2.92m | £3.75m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £883.19k | £344.58k | £255.03k | £790.47k | £1.56m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.43m | £3.69m | £6.01m | £8.51m | £10.52m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £170.41k | £0 | £0 | £25.95k | £1.38m | |
|
Income - Investment | £414.30k | £439.33k | £527.96k | £502.89k | £558.20k | |
|
Income - Other | £202.21k | £289.52k | £383.47k | £464.74k | £431.85k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £174.78k | £2.00k | £661.84k | £49.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.16m | £6.11m | £8.25m | £9.68m | £10.75m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.06m | £152.10k | £389.33k | £817.82k | £1.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £163.14k | £174.47k | £137.79k | £100.90k | £126.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £72.38k | £82.23k | £92.83k | £94.68k | £89.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £250.78k | £298.06k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £36.39m | £36.53m | £44.79m | £45.69m | £45.51m | |
|
Long-term investments | £14.27m | £17.66m | £17.68m | £18.70m | £20.71m | |
|
Other assets | £1.33m | £1.66m | £4.01m | £6.76m | £10.71m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£512.27k | -£514.68k | -£989.83k | -£1.02m | -£73.61k | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.14m | £9.28m | £18.70m | £19.80m | £19.95m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTER AND STATUTES OF 22 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIGION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH IN THE UNIVERSITY. B) TO PROVIDE FOR PERSONS WHO SHALL BE MEMBERS OF THE UNIVERSITY A COLLEGE WHEREIN THEY MAY WORK FOR DEGREES OF THE UNIVERSITY OR MAY CARRY OUT POSTGRADUATE OR OTHER SPECIAL STUDIES AT CAMBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lucy Cavendish College
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0BU
- Phone:
- 01223332190
- Email:
- BURSAR@LUCY.CAM.AC.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window