Financial history BARBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £20.41k £27.36k £30.91k £28.27k £28.52k
Total expenditure £12.10k £11.63k £38.11k £19.47k £21.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.98k £16.75k £2.67k N/A N/A