Trustees BALTONSBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD TRUST
Charity number: 304471

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Brian Pelly | Chair | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Long | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Stewart Faulkener | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Cotton | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Genia Pirrie | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Hyldon | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Franks | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eric Ashley Conway | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE RITCHIE | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Amanda Clow | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Ludovic Ghislain Medlicott | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Sessions | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.