Financial history MILBORNE PORT MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELD

Charity Number: 304584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.22k £6 £5.05k £6.98k £5.97k
Total expenditure £2.30k £2.02k £2.28k £6.91k £6.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A