Financial history BURES COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 304867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.00k £21.62k £21.62k £29.07k £31.42k
Total expenditure £29.00k £21.16k £21.16k £26.09k £24.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.20k N/A N/A N/A