BANSTEAD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BCA is principally involved in providing a Community Hall to accommodate the activities of its Constituent Groups, as well as providing space for other activities of interest to the residents of Banstead and the surrounding areas both through local charities and on a commercial basis. The programme covers a broad range of leisure and sporting activities and is well supported.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 23 April 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Crowley | Chair | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mary Mewett | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ann Parker | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Jonathan James Collins | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Greenhalgh Baines | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
RODERICK ARTHUR McFARLANE | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
David Talbot | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gail Fraser | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Benjamin Mills | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Collier | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Ash | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Frost | Trustee | 28 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anne Ford | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MARGARET BOWES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA BELCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID STANLEY PETERKEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAURICE TREVOR OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Malcolm John CUNNINGS | Trustee |
|
||||||
SAM WALSH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.66k | £50.07k | £71.28k | £91.30k | £110.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.52k | £51.57k | £94.47k | £62.02k | £88.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.34k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £16.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH JANUARY 1962 AS AMENDED 10TH MARCH 1972, 21ST MARCH 1997 AND 20TH MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
(A) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE NORTH EAST AND SOUTH EAST WARDS OF BANSTEAD URBAN DISTRICT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIQIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH TH OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE SAID ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Court Field
De Burgh Park
Banstead
Surrey
SM7 2PP
- Phone:
- 01737 358742
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window