Financial history BROOKWOOD WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 304981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £30.07k £19.69k £48.01k £49.84k £71.36k
Total expenditure £41.71k £15.34k £29.82k £33.39k £50.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £700 £2.67k N/A £19.18k