PITTON VILLAGE HALL PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain the Village Hall for the communal benefit of the inhabitants of Pitton and its surrounds, providing first class hall facilities at an affordable cost to voluntary organisations serving the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 03 September 1970: Standard registration
- PITTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Williams | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Van Gore | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Williams | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen O'Hara | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Clark | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Fowler | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Marie Taylor | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Stephen Coppock | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Mardon | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jill Helen Gore | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicola McCarney | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian Edward Cudby | Trustee | 19 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
John Llewellyn Veck | Trustee | 01 February 2010 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Judd | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.38k | £22.82k | £35.96k | £19.30k | £16.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.80k | £11.29k | £19.43k | £16.82k | £24.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.53k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST 15 AUGUST 1968 CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED 11 NOVEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL, PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF PITTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Homefield
White Hill
Pitton
Salisbury
SP5 1DU
- Phone:
- 01722712600
- Email:
- briancudby8@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window