SALISBURY UNIT 296 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE AIM OF THE SEA CADET CORPS IS TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE TOWARDS RESPONSIBLE ADULTHOOD AND TO ENCOURAGE THEM TO REACH THIRE POTENTIAL BY DEVELOPING VALUABLE PERSONAL ATTRIBUTES AND HIGH STANDARDS OF CONDUCT, USING A NATUTICAL THEME BASED ON THE CUSTOMS AND TRADITIONS OF THE ROYAL NAVY. THE SCC IS A NATIONWIDE YOUTH ORGANISATION OPEN TO YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 10 TO 18.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 22 October 1968: Standard registration
- T.S SALISBURY (Working name)
- SALISBURY UNIT NO 296 SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR P A LAWES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
FATHER DAVID FISHER | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Ross Cowen | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fritz Macaulay | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Donna Howden | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Seamus Bilton | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.03k | £26.95k | £26.80k | £22.18k | £23.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.96k | £13.49k | £22.19k | £24.96k | £21.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £11.24k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bushey Leaze
Partridge Hill
Landford
Salisbury
SP5 2BB
- Phone:
- 01794322736
- Email:
- philip.lawes@btopenworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window