Financial history BLACKDOWN DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 305633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £267.63k £72.58k £149.65k £150.76k £187.74k
Total expenditure £91.02k £85.83k £109.60k £1.72m £168.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £26.00k N/A N/A N/A