1ST WILTON BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of Wilton Scout Group to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £31,680
Total expenditure: £29,006

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • 1ST WILTON SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VICKI REGAN Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST CORPORATION Trustee
4TH ST HELENS (ST ANN'S CHURCH) RAINHILL SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
40TH HARTLEPOOL SCOUT GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.69k £37.19k £38.32k £39.88k £31.68k
Total expenditure £15.85k £17.64k £21.25k £38.06k £29.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.53k £8.00k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2025 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2025 364 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2025 729 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 January 2025 729 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2025 1094 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 January 2025 1094 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 CLARENDON CLOSE
DINTON
SALISBURY
SP3 5HG
Phone:
01722743403
Website:

No information available