Financial history THE LUCAS TOOTH TRUST

Charity number: 306055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £21.58k £14.34k £14.50k £15.49k £15.44k
Total expenditure £22.00k £12.64k £13.35k £12.68k £11.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A