THE COUNCIL OF MILTON ABBEY SCHOOL LTD

Charity number: 306318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main activity of Milton Abbey is running a co-educational school for 13 - 18 year old pupils,inspiring children of all academic standards to achieve the very best in everything they do. Pupils are encouraged to have big ambitions, great confidence and good hearts. The school offers Bursaries, provides facilities for use by the local community and supports both local and national charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MILTON ABBEY SCHOOL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN GEOFFREY BROMILOW Chair 08 March 2017
None on record
Justin Frampton Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Dr Richard Nickinson Trustee 09 February 2022
None on record
Natalie Perry Trustee 09 February 2022
None on record
Colonel Neil Kirkby Gow Tomlin Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
MATTHEW DAMIAN LLOYD NOYCE MCSI Trustee 08 March 2017
None on record
NEIL STEPHEN BOULTON Trustee 09 November 2016
None on record
THE REVEREND CANON CHARLES WILLIAM MITCHELL-INNES MA Trustee 23 June 2015
None on record
Colonel Oliver John Harben Chamberlain QVRM TD DL Trustee 06 March 2013
THE HARBEN ARMOURY FUND
Received: On time
YEOMANRY BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
THE DORSET ARMY CADET LEAGUE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.63m £7.29m £7.82m £7.73m £8.16m
Total expenditure £7.48m £7.05m £7.37m £7.61m £8.32m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £374.07k £287.80k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £42.10k £440.53k £297.22k £12.15k £57.32k
Income - Other trading activities £243.59k £26.95k £132.80k £199.46k £238.04k
Income - Charitable activities £7.23m £6.74m £7.02m £7.49m £7.83m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £37.62k £33.84k £35.07k £35.73k £38.98k
Income - Other £71.71k £43.72k £335.95k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.81m £6.59m £7.08m £7.61m £8.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £93 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £107 £980 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £673.35k £457.89k £295.88k £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £11.56m £11.48m £11.30m £11.19m £13.17m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £776.72k £501.69k £752.12k £543.26k £992.19k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £9.78m £9.19m £8.82m £8.37m £8.87m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 July 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 July 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 SEPTEMBER 1968
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF TWO PRIZES TO BE AWARDED ANNUALLY IN THE FORM OF BOOKS OR OTHER APPROPRIATE PRIZES TO TWO PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 18 April 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Milton Abbey School
DORSET
Blandford Forum
Dorset
DT11 0BZ
Phone:
01258880484