Financial history THORNLEIGH CAMPHILL COMMUNITIES LIMITED

Charity Number: 307104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.87m £6.50m £6.74m £6.10m £7.43m
Total expenditure £6.39m £6.32m £6.57m £6.68m £7.22m
Income from government contracts £6.84m £6.48m £6.56m £6.07m £6.43m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £27.33k £14.99k £15.92k £11.17k £966.41k
Income - Other trading activities £4.94k £1.26k £4.11k £9.47k £8.25k
Income - Charitable activities £6.84m £6.48m £6.72m £6.07m £6.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.47k £232 £835 £15.65k £26.70k
Income - Other £0 £495 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.38m £6.31m £6.56m £6.66m £7.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £10.88k £10.23k £15.65k £21.41k £13.32k
Expenditure - Governance £22.65k £19.02k £0 £24.70k £29.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0