GREEN BUSINESS NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to preserve and protect the environment, in particular by providing courses, lectures and seminars, and other additional materials on environmental issues and how these issues can be addressed within the context of business activities; and to educate the public about the environment and environmental issues, in particular within the context of business issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 28 May 1998: Standard registration
- 25 November 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 25 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1069229 THE FOREST OF MARSTON VALE TRUST
- BEDFORDSHIRE GBN (Previous name)
- THE BEDFORDSHIRE GREEN BUSINESS NETWORK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.56k | £5.31k | £16.25k | £4.81k | £3.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.68k | £11.51k | £4.36k | £5.20k | £5.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 August 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 17 August 2024 | 18 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 28 JUL 2020 as amended on 20 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING COURSES, LECTURES, SEMINARS AND OTHER ADDITIONAL MATERIALS ON ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES AND HOW THESE ISSUES CAN BE ADDRESSED WITHIN THE CONTEXT OF BUSINESS ACTIVITIES; AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ENVIRONMENT AND ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES, IN PARTICULAR WITHIN THE CONTEXT OF BUSINESS ACTIVITIES. (1) TO ARRANGE AND PROVIDE FOR OR JOIN IN AND ARRANGING AND PROVIDING FOR THE HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS, MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES, SEMINARS AND TRAINING COURSES, WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE. (2) TO COLLECT AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ON ALL MATTERS AFFECTING THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY AND EXCHANGE SUCH INFORMATION WITH OTHER BODIES HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS, WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE. (3) TO PUBLISH ANY MATERIALS AND TO ISSUE ANY MEMORANDA, WHETHER WRITTEN OR ORAL(OR PARTLY IN WRITING AND PARTLY ORAL) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND PROMOTE THE AWARENESS OF THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, BUT IN PRACTICE PRINCIPALLY BEDFORDSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window