NITON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Art & Craft Classes, Short Mat Bowls, Country & Tap Dancing, Exercise classes, Niton W.I., Niton & Whitwell Horticultural Society, The Pepperpot Players Amateur Dramatic Club, Yoga Sunshine Club, Community Coffee Mornings, Table Tennis, Private Hire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 18 February 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ANDREW STOTESBURY | Chair |
|
||||||||
Gaye Roberta Rolfe | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Watts | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Wells | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Wakefield | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
John Wells | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Michael Cooper | Trustee | 30 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.75k | £13.21k | £3.73k | £7.17k | £6.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.57k | £2.72k | £3.07k | £4.09k | £4.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17 SEP 1935 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18 FEB 1982
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENACNE VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF NITON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT FO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NITON
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHESTNUT COTTAGE
SCHOOL LANE
NITON
VENTNOR
PO38 2BP
- Phone:
- 01983731450
- Email:
- j.mwells@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window