THE DOMINIC BARKER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research into stammering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Denmark
- South Africa
- Sweden
Governance
- 17 July 1997: Standard registration
- DOM'S FUND (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TOBY KRAMERS | Chair | 16 March 2013 |
|
|||||
Norbert Lieckfeldt | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Aggett | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
DR Stephen Davis | Trustee | 19 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
GUY WILLIAM BARKER | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHLOE CHANCELLOR | Trustee | 16 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR LOUISE BARKER | Trustee | 10 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.57k | £41.90k | £37.76k | £30.29k | £37.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.30k | £59.72k | £26.46k | £44.05k | £37.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 1ST MAY 1997 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 11 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CAUSES AND RELIEF OF STAMMERING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
POUND CLOSE
HARKSTEAD ROAD
HOLBROOK
IPSWICH
IP9 2RA
- Phone:
- 01473328530
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window