Accounts and annual returns JOHN SPICER'S APPRENTICING CHARITY

Charity Number: 307742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 15 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 29 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required