Financial history REAL DPO LTD

Charity number: 1061671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £573.64k £811.21k £585.17k £603.42k £606.66k
Total expenditure £667.28k £746.12k £575.05k £664.40k £624.60k
Income from government contracts £546.04k £544.50k £242.45k £269.83k £355.03k
Income from government grants N/A £208.15k £208.15k £208.15k £116.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.84k £28.46k £59.30k £21 £44
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £569.59k £782.20k £524.87k £602.64k £599.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £212 £38 £30 £757 £4.83k
Income - Other £0 £508 £971 £0 £2.19k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £667.28k £746.12k £575.05k £664.40k £622.91k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.69k
Expenditure - Governance £4.49k £4.32k £4.37k £4.43k £4.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0