THE ROYAL ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITAL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's key purpose is to use it's resources to support the NHS and specifically the services provided by The Royal Orthopaedic Hospital NHS Foundation Trust. The type of activities that the charity funds are training and research, provision of specialist medical equipment and services that would not normally be provided from NHS resources but enhance the patients experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 03 November 1999: Standard registration
- THE ROYAL ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITAL NHS TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Hartland | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jan Teo | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Page | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Belza | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gursharn Malhi | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Grainger-Lloyd | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Brockie | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Reckless | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ayodele Ajose | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gianjeet Hunjan | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simone Jordan | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marie Peplow | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Revell | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Stephen Washbourne | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|||||
TIM PILE | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.00k | £673.00k | £689.00k | £160.00k | £242.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £430.00k | £229.00k | £584.00k | £300.00k | £458.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £635.00k | £650.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £38.00k | £39.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £51.00k | £613.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £218.00k | £554.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £11.00k | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £5.00k | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £2.49k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT 1791 OF 22 AUGUST 1997 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS OF 12 OCTOBER 1999 AND 16 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE ROYAL ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITAL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITAL
THE WOODLANDS
BRISTOL ROAD SOUTH
NORTHFIELD
BIRMINGHAM
B31 2AP
- Phone:
- 01216854006
- Email:
- roc@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window