LADY FRANCES WINCHCOMBE'S THATCHAM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making educational grants to individual young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 11 September 1962: Standard registration
- 09 March 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 March 2015: Re-registered
- THE WINCHCOMBE CHARITY (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MARK DAVID BENNET | Chair | 14 May 2012 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Rev Stephen Mark Newbold | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Gerald Anthony Cowan | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
ERIKA JOAN TIPTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Dr ROBERT GEOFFREY TAYTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.73k | £2.15k | £5.26k | £2.40k | £5.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34k | £669 | £5.51k | £4.16k | £2.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED 15TH JULY 1994
Charitable objects
SEE CLAUSE 23 OF SCHEME.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF THATCHAM, BUCKLEBURY AND COLD ASH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Wythe Close
Hermitage
THATCHAM
Berkshire
RG18 9WP
- Phone:
- 07830523460
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window