Financial history CROSFIELDS SCHOOL

Charity number: 309108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.46m £8.38m £9.54m £11.23m £13.15m
Total expenditure £7.41m £7.58m £9.70m £12.18m £13.25m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £63.11k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £182.46k £109.04k £767 £0 £100
Income - Other trading activities £199.10k £202.38k £291.11k £347.19k £392.08k
Income - Charitable activities £7.06m £8.07m £9.25m £10.40m £12.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.01k £0 £0 £0 £54.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £488.70k £35.82k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.22m £7.38m £9.52m £11.95m £13.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.39k £17.60k £2.40k £216 £216
Expenditure - Governance £14.38k £46.51k £19.36k £25.45k £30.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £188.87k £182.05k £176.48k £227.34k £224.58k