Trustees CROSFIELDS SCHOOL

Charity number: 309108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLIN JOHN HAYFIELD Trustee 29 January 2025
ORLEY FARM SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Lindsey Deborah Jane Hughes Trustee 29 January 2025
None on record
Sarah Louise Stocks-Wilson Trustee 29 January 2025
None on record
Ian Galvin Trustee 31 January 2024
None on record
Elona Mortimer-Zhika Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Michelle Lawrence Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Richard Plumpton Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Dr Elizabeth Anne Dawes Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Deborah Battersby Trustee 29 November 2021
None on record
Alison Jane Atkinson Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
Mark Wardrop Trustee 23 April 2020
None on record
Joe Sefton Jenkins Trustee 21 January 2019
None on record
Mark Turner Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Shashi Sachdeva Trustee 08 June 2015
None on record