Financial history WOODSTOCK EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024 31/03/2025
Total gross income £11.57k £9.62k £9.02k £8.16k £14.40k
Total expenditure £8.51k £8.53k £9.36k £9.63k £12.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A