PINEWOOD SCHOOL LTD

Charity number: 309642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance education by the provision of a day and boarding school (in or near Bourton, Oxfordshire) and by ancillary or incidental educational activities and other associated activities for the benefit of the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire
  • Reading
  • West Berkshire
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • PINEWOOD SCHOOL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Ian White Chair 09 August 2016
TOWER HOUSE HORSES CIO
Received: On time
ST SWITHUN'S SCHOOL (WINCHESTER)
Received: On time
Dr Katie Tilney Trustee 15 April 2025
None on record
Sarah Davies Trustee 23 November 2024
None on record
Lucy Robins Trustee 26 November 2022
None on record
Charlotte Sophie Mintern Trustee 08 July 2022
None on record
Alisdair Wade Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Susan Agnes Ross Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Andrew Christopher Tower Inglis Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Beth Robertson Trustee 27 August 2019
None on record
Nicola Anne Huggett Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Rebecca Jane Dougall Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
Emma Acworth Madeline Nancy Cripwell Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Philip James Lough Trustee 01 May 2012
FRIENDS OF MARKET LAVINGTON SURGERY
Received: On time
DAUNTSEY'S SCHOOL
Received: On time
EDWARD GEORGE MAWLE Trustee 02 February 2012
None on record
GUY PETER WOODROFFE FOSTER Trustee 08 June 2011
None on record
JULIAN CHARLES BIRCH Trustee 08 June 2011
None on record
DAVID JOHN FAWCUS Trustee
None on record
ROBIN FRANCIS BADHAM-THORNHILL Trustee
KING'S SCHOOL, BRUTON
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.33m £5.90m £6.46m £6.96m £7.66m
Total expenditure £5.51m £5.59m £5.85m £6.32m £7.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £204.27k £84.22k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £35.07k £34.28k £28.98k £22.30k £23.38k
Income - Other trading activities £19.10k £0 £0 £15.11k £55.81k
Income - Charitable activities £5.80m £5.35m £6.34m £6.93m £7.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26.19k £13.79k £7.61k £1.26k £34.28k
Income - Other £449.90k £495.08k £0 £0 £466.19k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.51m £5.59m £5.85m £6.32m £7.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £100.23k £10.38k £120.22k £133.79k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £13.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £8.32m £9.56m £9.35m £10.90m £11.14m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £3.62m £2.75m £3.58m £3.98m £4.16m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.14m £2.22m £2.23m £3.53m £3.39m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PINEWOOD SCHOOL
BOURTON
SWINDON
SN6 8HZ
Phone:
01793784808