THE OLD MEMBERS' SCHOLARSHIP AND EXHIBITION FUND IN CONNECTION WITH LINCOLN COLLEGE, OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are made to graduates at Lincoln College, Oxford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 January 1966: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Mohit Dalwadi | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Christina Franzese | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr HUGH MCINTYRE | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEFFAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
LADY BARNARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
EDMOND JOHN HAYES | Trustee |
|
||||||
DR JEREMY RICHARD OSBORN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.83k | £1.42k | £3.31k | £2.97k | £2.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.35k | £2.45k | £1.35k | £950 | £2.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 17TH APRIL 1934, VARIED BY SCHEME OF 29TH NOVEMBER 1965 AND ORDER OF 30TH APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS OR BURSARIES TENABLE AT LINCOLN COLLEGE, OXFORD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LINCOLN COLLEGE
TURL STREET
OXFORD
OX1 3DR
- Phone:
- 01865287351
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window