RICHARD HUMFREY (EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Half yearly meetings to consider finances and make grants as appropriate to individuals and organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 16 May 1962: Standard registration
- RICHARD HUMFREY (EDUCATIONAL) (Previous name)
- RICHARD HUMPHERY (EDUCATIONAL) (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Shephard | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Legrand | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Edward Frost | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Margaret Rosemary McDonnell | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Richard William Barron | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rev Stephen Trott | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
|||||||
Dr Helen Coghill | Trustee | 23 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.04k | £2.08k | £2.14k | £2.17k | £2.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.24k | £1.31k | £2.17k | £1.85k | £2.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6TH AUGUST 1915 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 24TH NOVEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF BOUGHTON WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE GOVERNING INSTRUMENT.
Area of benefit
CIVIL PARISH OF BOUGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROWANHURST
VYSE ROAD
BOUGHTON
NORTHAMPTON
NN2 8RP
- Phone:
- 01604847890
- Email:
- jandrgist@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window