ELEANOR HAMILTON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 309997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDES GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES TO HELP CHILDREN IN THE SECOND YEAR OF GCSE OR "A" LEVEL EDUCATION DEPENDING ON SOCIAL AND FINANCIAL NEED. PROVIDES BURSARIES AT TWO COLLEGES AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TUTORS CONCERNED. ALSO GENERAL CHARITABLE GIVING

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £239,850
Total expenditure: £427,358

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 March 1965: Standard registration
  • 16 December 2015: Funds received from 239432 THE SECOND SIDBURY TRUST
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JENNIFER NYIRI Chair
None on record
EMILY JENNIFER BRANDON Trustee 18 January 2018
None on record
Wilfrid Edward Vernor-Miles Trustee 03 April 2014
CATHOLIC CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SYLVANUS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PINE RIDGE DOG SANCTUARY
Received: On time
MVM CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
RUTH SMART FOUNDATION
Received: On time
F C CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE INDEPENDENT PRESS REGULATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF ST PIUS X
Received: On time
THE MICHAEL KIRK AND NOREEN BLYTH-WHITELOCK CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DAVID PETER ORR Trustee 11 October 2012
CATHOLIC CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MR JOHN CROSFIELD VERNOR MILES Trustee
CATHOLIC CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SYLVANUS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF ST PIUS X
Received: On time
RUTH SMART FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PINE RIDGE DOG SANCTUARY
Received: On time
HOBSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MVM CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
WILLIAM BRANDON MA Trustee
None on record
Dr PAULINE BRANDON Trustee
None on record
INGO HIPPISLEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £269.71k £216.51k £251.24k £242.99k £239.85k
Total expenditure £386.50k £378.92k £369.35k £394.34k £427.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 20 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 09 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 09 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 22 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 22 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 04 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HUNTERS
9 NEW SQUARE
LONDON
WC2A 3QN
Phone:
02074120050
Website:

No information available