TRINITY LABAN CONSERVATOIRE OF MUSIC AND DANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Specialist, practice-based higher education to equip students for successful careers as performers, composers and choreographers in the fields of music and contemporary dance. Lifelong learning opportunities in dance and music. Outreach and community-based projects. Promotion of research and scholarship to advance the art forms of music and dance. Provision of music and dance performances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£28,454,852
Donations and legacies | £1.37m | |
Charitable activities | £22.34m | |
Other trading activities | £3.68m | |
Investments | £439.37k | |
Other | £622.35k |
Total expenditure:
£25,694,213
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £25.42m | |
Other | £279.10k |
£1,197,209 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,387,919 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £279.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £25.42m | |
Retained for future use | £2.76m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £279.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £25.42m | |
Retained for future use | £3.96m |
People

334 Employee(s)
22 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 11 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- LABAN (Working name)
- TRINITY LABAN (Working name)
- TRINITY COLLEGE OF MUSIC, LONDON (Previous name)
- TRINITY LABAN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Davey | Chair | 02 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Rhys Maycock | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mabel Hawthorne | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Neil Alan Thomas | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Emma Catherine Kerr | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ae Ryun Anne Kim | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mark Steven Maximilian Puller | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Roger Wilson | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Dame Nicola Dandridge DBE | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Amanda Gough | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter Robert Nagle | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Laura Cunningham | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Majella Anning | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Michael John Elliott | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Narind Singh | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jocelyn Ann Prudence | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
JOHN DAVID CROMPTON | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Bill Robinson | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
Deborah Harris | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
SAM JACKSON | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
MARTIN JAMES KETTLE | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR ANTHONY BOWNE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.54m | £27.57m | £27.75m | £26.79m | £28.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.30m | £26.64m | £30.43m | £29.02m | £25.69m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.82m | £5.83m | £5.86m | £6.31m | £6.39m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.01m | £3.48m | £2.83m | £1.20m | £1.37m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £4.01m | £3.90m | £3.81m | £3.59m | £3.68m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £14.44m | £19.94m | £20.78m | £21.34m | £22.34m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £1.91k | £1.39m | £135.26k | £19.58k | £14.63k | |
|
Income - Investment | £259.65k | £245.28k | £322.35k | £395.13k | £439.37k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £263.78k | £622.35k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £24.30m | £26.64m | £30.43m | £28.72m | £25.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £56.00k | £134.52k | £199.61k | £93.00k | £111.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £304.95k | £279.10k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £39.94m | £38.97m | £38.68m | £37.66m | £36.34m | |
|
Long-term investments | £9.42m | £12.52m | £12.62m | £11.33m | £10.90m | |
|
Other assets | £4.43m | £4.64m | £3.69m | £2.08m | £2.20m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£8.07m | -£5.50m | -£5.47m | -£5.57m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £19.99m | £19.85m | £18.80m | £16.55m | £16.77m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 1.2.1897 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 25.3.1981 AND AS AMENDED 23 MARCH 2005 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 18 MARCH 2008. as amended on 08 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, DANCE AND ASSOCIATED ART FORMS GENERALLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO IMPROVE THE PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL EDUCATION OF MUSIC, DANCE AND OTHER STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY LABAN
KING CHARLES COURT
OLD ROYAL NAVAL COLLEGE
KING WILLIAM WALK
LONDON
SE10 9JF
- Phone:
- 02083059400
- Email:
- secretary@trinitylaban.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window