MERCHANT TAYLORS' EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- the maintenance, improvement and support of Merchant Taylors' School; - the benefit of the said school or of all or any of the pupils attending the said school in any manner which is exclusively charitable; - the founding or support of schools of learning generally; - the advancement of education generally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£35,557,000
Donations and legacies | £177.00k | |
Charitable activities | £33.01m | |
Other trading activities | £405.00k | |
Investments | £925.00k | |
Other | £1.04m |
Total expenditure:
£32,750,000
Raising funds | £722.00k | |
Charitable activities | £31.94m | |
Other | £92.00k |
-£728,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £814.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £31.94m | |
Retained for future use | £2.81m |
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JACKSON | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Lady Annie Harding | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Robb | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
PETER HOWARD WATKINS | Trustee | 14 July 2015 |
|
|||||||
CHRISTOPHER PETER HARE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.87m | £29.53m | £31.36m | £32.62m | £35.56m | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.12m | £27.77m | £28.64m | £30.61m | £32.75m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.02m | £324.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £138.28k | £147.71k | £87.00k | £79.00k | £177.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £311.03k | £220.50k | £182.00k | £392.00k | £405.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £28.60m | £28.47m | £29.27m | £31.15m | £33.01m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £583.19k | £451.84k | £412.00k | £514.00k | £925.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £239.48k | £243.13k | £1.41m | £484.00k | £1.04m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £27.56m | £27.23m | £28.23m | £29.94m | £31.94m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £529.65k | £518.18k | £406.00k | £664.00k | £722.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.87k | £15.44k | £30.00k | £12.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £744.26k | £476.17k | £636.00k | £640.00k | £661.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £31.12k | £22.71k | £2.00k | £6.00k | £92.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £34.34m | £37.53m | £38.10m | £37.85m | £39.92m | |
|
Long-term investments | £17.33m | £15.32m | £19.61m | £17.89m | £17.60m | |
|
Other assets | £8.25m | £8.28m | £8.32m | £11.59m | £12.73m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.63m | £6.13m | £5.28m | £6.37m | £7.21m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 AUG 1967 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 JUN 1997 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 26 APR 2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 21 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE TRUST PROPERTY SHALL BE HELD AND APPLIED FOR OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS (WHETHER EDUCATIONAL OR OTHERWISE) IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND BOTH CAPITAL AND INCOME WITHOUT DISTINCTION SHALL BE SO APPLICABLE. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE PRIMARY TRUST DECLARED BY CLAUSE 5 HEREOF BUT SUBJECT AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE PROVISIONS OF CLAUSE 22 HEREOF THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR SELECTION OF PARTICULAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES TAKE INTO CONSIDERATION AND PAY SPECIAL REGARD TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES (THAT IS TO SAY):- (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE SUPPORT TO THE MTET SCHOOLS (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, PRIZES OR OTHER AWARDS OR GRANTS TO PUPILS ATTENDING ANY OF THE MTET SCHOOLS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, PRIZES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TO ANY FORMER PUPIL OF ANY OF THE MTET SCHOOLS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND VOCATIONAL) EDUCATION. (D) THE FOUNDING OR PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS FELLOWSHIPS LECTURESHIPS AND PRIZES IN CONNECTION WITH ANY SCHOOL UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL BODY THE REDUCTION OF SCHOOL OR UNIVERSITY FEES THE PROVISION OF FREE EDUCATION AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF SCHOOL OR UNIVERSITY AMENITIES. (E) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GENERALLY. (F) THE MAKING OF GIFTS OF MONEY OR OTHER PROPERTY IN THE FREE DISPOSITION OF THE TRUST TO OTHER BODIES HAVING OBJECTS SOLELY CHARITABLE (WHETHER OR NOT SUCH OBJECTS ARE SIMILAR TO ANY OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- 05 November 2003 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Merchant Taylors Co
Merchant Taylors Hall
30 Threadneedle Street
LONDON
EC2R 8JB
- Phone:
- 02075622320
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window