Financial history KING'S COLLEGE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 310024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £35.72m £37.74m £42.77m £43.48m £50.89m
Total expenditure £31.78m £33.31m £35.46m £37.95m £43.55m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £577.00k £110.66k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.10m £1.08m £2.65m £600.00k £1.03m
Income - Other trading activities £1.98m £2.97m £3.97m £4.60m £6.21m
Income - Charitable activities £32.00m £33.68m £36.12m £38.05m £42.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £56.00k £20.00k £28.00k £232.00k £1.03m
Income - Other £577.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £202.00k £158.00k £2.03m £21.00k £201.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £30.23m £32.01m £33.83m £36.00m £40.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.56m £1.30m £1.63m £1.95m £2.75m
Expenditure - Governance £70.00k £69.00k £87.00k £76.00k £103.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0