RAVENGLASS AND ESKDALE RAILWAY PRESERVATION SOCIETY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support operation of the Ravenglass and Eskdale Railway
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 08 January 1998: Standard registration
- RAVENGLASS AND ESKDALE RAILWAY PRESERVATION TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DIANA SUSAN CHASE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
James Ross Duggan | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
David William Thomas Sibson | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
John Branson Chapman | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Graham Clayton | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Nicholas Johnson | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Jackman | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID LEES | Trustee | 11 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD ROBINSON | Trustee | 19 August 2012 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID WILLIAM MOSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JACQULENE PHARAOH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
IAIN ALDRED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER VAN ZELLER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
STUART HARRISON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.32k | £25.66k | £17.48k | £17.04k | £5.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.15k | £24.53k | £7.09k | £3.55k | £289 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE THE RAILWAY LINE BETWEEN RAVENGLASS AND ESKDALE IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA AND THE MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF SUCH STRUCTURES BUILDINGS PLANT LOCOMOTIVES ROLLING STOCK AND EQUIPMENT ON OR ADJACENT TO OR CONNECTED WITH THE SAID RAILWAY AS ARE OF HISTORICAL, CULTURAL, ARCHITECTURAL, CONSTRUCTIONAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST OR EXHIBIT CRAFTSMANSHIP WORTHY OF PRESERVATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Westmorland Road
SALE
Cheshire
M33 3QX
- Phone:
- 07899946306
- Email:
- secretary@rerps.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window