CRAWFORD'S SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 February 1963: Standard registration
- 08 July 2013: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 08 July 2013: Funds transferred to 248919 ST EDMUNDSBURY AND IPSWICH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINAN...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 24 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 07 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 24 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 10 DECEMBER 1860, ORDER DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 1951 AND SCHEME OF 27TH FEBRUARY 1961.
Charitable objects
A SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS TO BE EDUCATED AS DAY SCHOLARS IN ALL USEFUL KNOWLEDGE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THEIR STATION IN LIFE AND IN ALL MORAL AND RELIGIOUS OBLIGATIONS AS TAUGHT IN THE ARTICLES AND CATECHISM OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HAUGHLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window