Financial history LADY CATHERINE GARDEMAU'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.61k £7.39k £7.59k £9.32k £9.56k
Total expenditure £12.27k £4.31k £2.45k £8.18k £12.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A