Financial history CHAPMAN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 310616
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/07/2020 12/07/2021 12/07/2022 12/07/2023 12/07/2024
Total gross income £13.09k £11.31k £12.40k £13.76k £14.52k
Total expenditure £11.60k £9.99k £10.00k £13.89k £14.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A