THE BUTLER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awards for children and students from the parishes of Little Baddow and Boreham, Essex for educational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 21 June 1963: Standard registration
- 25 July 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 25 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1052061 ESSEX COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.42k | £11.03k | £10.75k | £7.64k | £11.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.14k | £9.59k | £10.18k | £11.12k | £10.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 October 2021 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20 OCTOBER 1909 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 22 APRIL 1938
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF BOOKS OR FITTINGS FOR SCHOOL LIBRARIES. SPECIAL INSTRUCTION IN PRACTICAL AND TECHNICAL SUBJECTS EXHIBITIONS FOR EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY. APPRENTICING, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, WHO HAVE ATTENDED A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS. RESIDUE OF INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN AWARDING EXHIBITIONS FOR SECONDARY OR FURTHER EDUCATION. FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, CLOTHING, TOOLS, BOOKS, ETC., TO ASSIST ENTRY INTO A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING. APPRENTICING BENEFICIARIES TO SOME USEFUL TRADE OR CALLING, OTHERWISE PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION. (1972 SCHEME).
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF BOREHAM AND LITTLE BADDOW
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window