READ PRIZES FUND
Charity Number: 310848
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awarding yearly prizes to pupils attending Colbayns High School at Clacton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Total income: £757
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Essex
Governance
Registration history:
- 30 June 1976: Standard registration
- 15 April 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 15 April 2013: Funds transferred to 1052061 ESSEX COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £774 | £798 | £709 | £727 | £757 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 24 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 04 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 25 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 30/06/1976 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/03/2013
Charitable objects
AWARDING YEARLY PRIZES TO PUPILS ATTENDING COLBAYNS HIGH SCHOOL AT CLACTON.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window