Financial history ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE

Charity Number: 311073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.82m £14.43m £17.31m £18.34m £19.60m
Total expenditure £13.51m £13.36m £15.66m £19.83m £18.76m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.19k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.79k £53.66k £114.66k £15.89k £132.29k
Income - Other trading activities £95.14k £92.59k £138.35k £167.89k £71.07k
Income - Charitable activities £13.13m £14.06m £17.02m £17.94m £18.95m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.39k £839 £18.84k £149.52k £278.14k
Income - Other £571.23k £222.26k £13.27k £67.36k £166.79k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.45m £13.27m £15.47m £19.45m £18.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £53.72k £91.16k £194.87k £375.00k £239.77k
Expenditure - Governance £22.01k £36.63k £34.36k £41.54k £34.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £4.87k £8.69k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0