Trustees WESTMINSTER COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 311449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV Nigel Philip Uden Chair 24 March 2014
Downing Place United Reformed Church, Cambridge, General Funds Charity
Received: On time
Rev David McCourtie Miller Trustee 14 March 2025
WALKING 4 HOPE
Received: On time
Dr Alison Ruth Gray Trustee 14 March 2025
None on record
Rev Naomi Elisabeth Young-Rodas Trustee 14 March 2025
None on record
Rev Stuart Scott Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Darnette Whitby-Reid Trustee 06 December 2019
None on record
JOHN GEORGE ELLIS Trustee 01 October 2017
CHESHUNT COLLEGE (CAMBRIDGE)
Received: On time
THE CHAPELS SOCIETY
Received: On time
ALLIANCE HOUSE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CONGREGATIONAL MEMORIAL HALL TRUST
Received: On time
KENT WORKPLACE MISSION
Received: On time
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
William McVey Trustee 07 October 2016
None on record