Financial history THE RODBOROUGH OLD SCHOOL

Charity number: 311519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.04k £3.09k £8.21k £9.30k £10.83k
Total expenditure £6.63k £4.64k £8.81k £10.37k £30.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A