Financial history BEAUDESERT PARK SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 311711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.62m £6.58m £6.98m £7.72m £7.87m
Total expenditure £6.62m £6.38m £6.91m £7.30m £7.62m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £264.84k £162.72k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.16m £72.83k £3.50k £8.36k £1.25k
Income - Other trading activities £43.28k £4.11k £77.58k £87.99k £114.46k
Income - Charitable activities £6.12m £6.32m £6.89m £7.57m £7.64m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.90k £1.36k £6 £39.56k £110.61k
Income - Other £280.60k £184.17k £7.81k £17.80k £3.04k
Income - Legacies £0 £71.50k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.62m £6.38m £6.91m £7.30m £7.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £27.33k £21.84k £25.33k £25.80k £28.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0