Financial history BRIDEWELL ROYAL HOSPITAL

Charity number: 311997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £12.26m £12.66m £13.71m £14.77m £16.90m
Total expenditure £12.77m £12.81m £14.57m £16.50m £17.82m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £264.00k £140.00k £35.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £411.00k £995.00k £207.00k £160.00k £234.00k
Income - Other trading activities £284.00k £161.00k £242.00k £506.00k £876.00k
Income - Charitable activities £10.78m £10.82m £12.82m £13.78m £15.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £701.00k £0 £19.00k £0
Income - Investment £750.00k £653.00k £444.00k £329.00k £448.00k
Income - Other £37.00k £35.00k £1.00k £15.00k £7.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.54m £12.70m £14.37m £16.20m £17.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £232.00k £108.00k £194.00k £296.00k £500.00k
Expenditure - Governance £10.00k £9.00k £11.00k £23.60k £30.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £37.00k £42.00k £83.00k £101.00k £125.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0