Financial history THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE

Charity Number: 312046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £27.50m £29.27m £34.91m £37.73m £39.15m
Total expenditure £26.16m £27.47m £29.92m £32.93m £38.35m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £668.00k £102.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.95m £1.48m £1.45m £1.32m £1.27m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £341.00k £578.00k £836.00k £1.48m
Income - Charitable activities £25.12m £26.53m £31.08m £33.12m £36.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £574.00k
Income - Investment £437.00k £470.00k £514.00k £596.00k £965.00k
Income - Other £0 £451.00k £1.29m £1.86m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £10.00k £8.00k £114.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £25.90m £26.43m £29.00m £31.86m £36.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £260.00k £1.04m £916.00k £1.07m £1.41m
Expenditure - Governance £42.00k £43.00k £58.00k £74.00k £69.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £70.00k £74.00k £80.00k £75.00k £79.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £685.00k