Accounts and annual returns BEYNON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity Number: 312315

Charity reporting is overdue by 5678 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 4217 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 4217 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 4582 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 4582 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 4948 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 4948 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 5313 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 5313 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 5678 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 5678 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window