THE FRANCIS HOLLAND (CHURCH OF ENGLAND) SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust includes three separate girls' schools. Two of which are Senior Schools with Sixth Forms, for ages 11-18, and one is a Prep School for ages 4-11.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£31,136,000
Donations and legacies | £1.18m | |
Charitable activities | £29.73m | |
Other trading activities | £15.00k | |
Investments | £205.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£29,363,000
Raising funds | £165.00k | |
Charitable activities | £29.20m | |
Other | £0 |
-£145,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £165.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £29.20m | |
Retained for future use | £1.77m |
People

320 Employee(s)
18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 38 |
£70k to £80k | 33 |
£80k to £90k | 32 |
£90k to £100k | 9 |
£100k to £110k | 5 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 5 |
£150k to £200k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Westminster
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 26 February 1988: Standard registration
- FRANCIS HOLLAND SCHOOLS TRUST (Working name)
- THE FRANCIS HOLLAND SCHOOLS TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Omar Davis | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Von Malaise | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Owen Purcell | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Simon Andrews | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nathalie du Preez | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Hay | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Fiona Angel | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Frances Konadu Baawuah | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Barker | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Esther Regina van de Geijn | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Sherrington | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Woodham-Smith | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Walker | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Susanne Nedas | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cuthbert | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Gwenlan | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Novella De Renzo | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Leonard Rupert Fincham | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.30m | £22.75m | £25.31m | £27.46m | £31.14m | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.87m | £21.61m | £23.24m | £26.08m | £29.36m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £237.00k | £69.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £208.00k | £543.00k | £1.01m | £421.00k | £1.18m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £10.00k | £8.00k | £3.00k | £15.00k | £15.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £21.95m | £21.80m | £24.14m | £26.94m | £29.73m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £140.00k | £168.00k | £86.00k | £89.00k | £205.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £237.00k | £69.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £20.75m | £21.50m | £23.19m | £25.86m | £29.20m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £122.00k | £105.00k | £47.00k | £220.00k | £165.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £29.57m | £30.79m | £31.98m | £39.13m | £38.72m | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.79m | £3.90m | £4.62m | £4.32m | £4.27m | |
|
Other assets | £6.00m | £6.93m | £7.68m | £8.48m | £7.76m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.00m | £7.13m | £7.10m | £13.75m | £10.94m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/07/1931 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/09/1943 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 FEB 2017 as amended on 24 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR AND CARRY ON IN THE UNITED KINGDOM PUBLIC DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS, TO PROVIDE RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING THEREIN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, AND GENERALLY TO FOSTER EDUCATION AND MORAL AND RELIGIOUS TRAINING THEREIN.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Linked charities
- 26 February 1988 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Bourne Street
London
SW1W 8JA
- Phone:
- 02077308359
- Email:
- clerk@fhst.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window