Friends of the Nations' Libraries

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to promote the acquisition by national and regional libraries and archives of printed books, manuscripts and records of historical, literary, artistic, architectural, musical or such like interest and to assist the libraries in any other way which the Charity considers appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£584,471
Donations and legacies | £353.58k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £230.89k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£377,048
Raising funds | £102.03k | |
Charitable activities | £275.02k | |
Other | £0 |
£135,451 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £102.03k | |
Charitable expenditure | £275.02k | |
Retained for future use | £207.42k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £102.03k | |
Charitable expenditure | £275.02k | |
Retained for future use | £342.87k |
People

16 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 March 1963: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE NATIONAL LIBRARIES (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Geordie Greig | Chair | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Kathryn Sutherland | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Artemis Clare Antonia Cooper | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Anna Lisbet Kristina Rausing | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Rhodri Llwyd Morgan | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Tina Michelle Morton | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Mark Philip Stevens | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Mark Henry Storey | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Henry Charles Whittick | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Joan Sanborn Harris Winterkorn MBE | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Mary Anne Frances Gibson | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Joanna Margaret Barker MBE | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Amina Shah | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Jessica Pearsall Gardner | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor RICHARD OVENDEN OBE | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Charles Adam Laurie Sebag-Montefiore CBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £638.38k | £1.22m | £16.35m | £1.98m | £584.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £651.67k | £757.77k | £15.35m | £1.43m | £377.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £499.36k | £1.10m | £16.23m | £1.78m | £353.58k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £100.00k | £1.00m | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £139.03k | £120.71k | £114.40k | £197.79k | £230.89k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £21.60k | £12.18k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £580.85k | £700.26k | £15.26m | £1.35m | £275.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £70.82k | £57.51k | £87.66k | £75.75k | £102.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.82k | £1.00k | £0 | £1.47k | £13.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £579.03k | £699.26k | £15.26m | £1.35m | £261.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £18.07k | £17.49k | £19.92k | £13.23k | £12.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.85m | £3.87m | £4.49m | £5.02m | £5.14m | |
|
Other assets | £218.52k | £534.06k | £11.40m | £824.72k | £997.44k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £120.83k | £101.18k | £10.22m | £97.84k | £51.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 1932 AS AMENDED 1958, 1961, 1962, AND 14TH JULY 1977 as amended on 13 Dec 2019 as amended on 19 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS AND MANUSCRIPTS AS GIFTS TO THE NATIONAL LIBRARIES.(THE EXPRESSION "NATIONAL LIBRARIES" IS UNDERSTOOD PRIMARILY TO MEAN THE BRITISH MUSEUM, AND THE NATIONAL LIBRARIES OF SCOTLAND AND WALES; BUT THE SOCIETY WILL BE FREE, AS OCCASION ARISES, TO ASSIST ALSO UNIVERSITY, MUNICIPAL AND OTHER LIBRARIES TO SECURE PRINTED BOOKS OR MANUSCRIPTS WHICH HAVE SPECIAL INTEREST FOR THEM).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 4291
Reading
Berkshire
RG8 9JA
- Phone:
- 01491598083
- Email:
- admin@fnlmail.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window