IMAGO MUNDI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Produces the bi-annual 'Imago Mundi: the International Journal for the History of Cartography'. It is also responsible for coordinating the biennial series of International Conferences in the History of Cartography. In general, its aim is to promote and extend interest in the academic history of cartography worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 June 1963: Standard registration
- IMAGO MUNDI LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Wouter Bracke | Chair | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel Crouch | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Alfred Charles Hiatt | Trustee | 21 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas William Harper | Trustee | 21 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||
NICHOLAS ALAN MILLEA | Trustee | 21 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher James Fleet | Trustee | 21 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr JAMES RICHARD AKERMAN | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Dr MARKUS GUENTHER HEINZ | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR IMRE JOSEF DEMHARDT | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Dr CARME MONTANER | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||
CATHERINE HOFMANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANTHONY PETER PAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR MATTHEW HENRY EDNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr MARY SPONBERG PEDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PROF. ALEXEY VLADIMIROVICH POSTNIKOV | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Peter Michael Barber | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PROF ROGER JAMES PETER KAIN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DR SARAH JACQUELINE TYACKE CB | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Dr ZSOLT TOROK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.41k | £20.32k | £19.24k | £22.28k | £21.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.23k | £18.63k | £19.35k | £21.90k | £20.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 April 2023 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 April 2023 | 75 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 04 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF CARTOGRAPHY IN ALL ITS BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
31
Sandringham Road
London
London
UK
E10 6HJ
- Phone:
- 07474613362
- Email:
- a.hiatt@qmul.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window