COBHAM HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE COMPANY OWNS AND MANAGES AN HISTORIC SITE IN WHICH IT OPERATES AN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL IN MEMBERSHIP OF THE GIRLS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION, THE BOARDING SCHOOL ASSOCIATION AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES. THE SCHOOL SEEKS TO EDUCATE THE WHOLE PERSON BY EQUIPPING EACH STUDENT WITH THE KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS TO MAKE THE MOST OF THE OPPORTUNITES AVAILABLE TO WOMEN IN THE WORLD AND TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 13 November 1961: Standard registration
- WESTWOOD EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frankie Whitehead | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Margaret Grace Webb | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH MCRITCHIE | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr KATRINA O'NEILL-BYRNE | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN DAVID PENNELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN ANDERSON CALDER DICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.83m | £4.22m | £4.45m | £4.25m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.12m | £4.25m | £4.49m | £5.04m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £410.80k | £416.65k | £456.59k | £158.38k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.25m | £3.54m | £3.75m | £3.73m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £166.57k | £270.06k | £239.33k | £353.94k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.94m | £4.02m | £4.23m | £4.92m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £177.79k | £223.78k | £257.69k | £115.70k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/03/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/04/1995 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/06/2013 as amended on 26 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF INDIVIDUALS FROM THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF ONE OR MORE SCHOOLS IN ENGLAND AND WALES, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO MAINTAIN AND CARRY ON THE GIRLS' SCHOOL KNOWN AS COBHAM HALL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cobham Hall
Cobham
Gravesend
DA12 3BL
- Phone:
- 01474825903
- Email:
- StandenD@cobhamhall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window